skip to content

Mildon, Catherine Anne

CPSO#: 23128

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: In care of Dr. A, Mildon: 136B Cartwright Ave Toronto ON M6A 1V2
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Jul 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018