skip to content

Mikhail, Eric

CPSO#: 93646

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus - Psychiatry
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus - Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eric Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mikhail ( CPSO# 93646 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus - Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9


Corporation Name: E. Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Mikhail ( CPSO# 93646 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:17 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 19 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 18 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 18 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2015