Mikhail, Boutros Behnam Metry (CPSO#: 97445)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
188 East Main Street
Welland ON  L3B 3W8
Phone: (905) 714-9364
Fax: 905-714-0438
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queens Medical Centre
666 Appleby line -C105
Burlington
Burlington ON  L7L 5Y3
Canada
Phone: (905) 6349898
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Boutros Mikhail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mikhail ( CPSO# 97445 )

Business Address:
Castlemore Family Medical Centre
Suite 2
9960 Airport Road
Brampton ON  L6S 0C5
Phone Number: (905) 799-2273

Business Address:
666 Appleby Line
Suite C#105
Burlington ON  L7L 5Y3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOUTROS BEHNAM METRY MIKHAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIKHAIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2012