skip to content

Midha, Vishal Manohar

CPSO#: 92346

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Shivaji University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
444 Plumas Blvd
Yuba City CA  95991
United States
Phone: (530) 749-3420

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Midha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 22 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2011 Active
 Dr.  Vishal  Manohar  Midha  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  family
            medicine, only.