skip to content

Middleton, James Charles

CPSO#: 29298

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Middleton & Cannon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Thunder Bay Regional Hospital 980 Oliver Road Thunder Bay, ON P7B 6V4
Date Received: 26 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014