skip to content

Mick, Paul Thomas

CPSO#: 90207

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Mar 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
British Columbia
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2009 to 27 Feb 2009
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2019