skip to content

Michelis, Fotios

CPSO#: 97052

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2016
EXPIRY DATE
31 Mar 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Athens, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Suite 6-614
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4013
Fax: (416) 946-4407 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michelis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Michelis ( CPSO# 97052 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology and Hematology
610 University Avenue
OPG - 6-614
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2011 to 14 Feb 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Mar 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2023

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2016 Active
             1.    Dr. Fotios Michelis may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Haematology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Michelis holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Michelis  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Michelis'
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Michelis' certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 1, 2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on March 31, 2023.