skip to content

Michaud, Josee

CPSO#: 94660

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15-233 Brady St
233 Brady Street
Office # 15
Sudbury ON  P3B 4H5
Phone: 7059194578
Fax: 1-705-564-9078 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E3B8
Canada
Phone: (705) 723-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michaud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Michaud ( CPSO# 94660 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Business Address:
15-233 Brady Street
Sudbury ON  P3B 4H5
Phone Number: 7052229009


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 06 Aug 2019 Active
             As from August 6, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Josee Michaud in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Michaud to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                          DR. JOSEE MICHAUD
                                          ("Dr. Michaud")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Michaud, certificate of registration number 94660, am a member of
                  the College.  
            (3)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215865 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my cardiology
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        at least seven (7) months ("Clinical Supervision"). Clinical
                        Supervision shall cease only upon approval from the College.
                        During the period of high level supervision (as defined below), the
                        Clinical Supervisor must be an interventional cardiologist. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and within
                              fourteen (14) days of signing his or her undertaking at
                              Appendix "A" conduct an initial visit to all of my office
                              Practice Locations to review and provide feedback on patient
                              management and systems issues, including but not limited to: 
                  
                                    1.    timely triage of referrals; 
                  
                                    2.    timely triage of information regarding patients,
                                          including test results;
                  
                                    3.    timely dictation of and reporting on procedures,
                                          investigations, diagnostic testing, and
                                          consultations to referring physicians; 
                  
                                    4.    confidential and effective patient record
                                          management and storage; and 
                  
                                    5.    effective communication with staff.
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my office Practice Location, or another
                              location approved by the College, once every week for the
                              first month of Clinical Supervision ("high level
                              supervision").  Following the month of high level
                              supervision, upon the recommendation of the Clinical
                              Supervisor and with the approval of the College, the
                              frequency of meetings may be reduced to once every two (2)
                              weeks for a period of three (3) months ("moderate level
                              supervision").  Following the three (3) months of moderate
                              level supervision, upon the recommendation of the Clinical
                              Supervisor and with the approval of the College, the
                              frequency of meetings may be reduced to once every month for
                              a period of three (3) months ("low level supervision");
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College after every meeting, or
                              more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about
                              my standard of practice.
                  
            (c)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by
                  the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the
                  IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and any concerns that may arise
                  during the period of Clinical Supervision.

            (d)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                  Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking
                  and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations
                  of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended
                  practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

            (e)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking
                  is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the
                  date I execute this Undertaking.

            (f)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                  in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to
                  fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving
                  notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a
                  similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure
                  that it is delivered to the College within that time.

            (g)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                  Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or (f)
                  above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have
                  obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (h)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a
                  result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or
                  limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or
                  limitation will be included on the public register.

            (6)   Professional Education 

            (a)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all
                  aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including
                  all of the following professional education (the "Professional
                  Education"):

                  (i)   The following courses: 
                  
                        1.    Medical Record-keeping Course, University of Toronto -
                              www.cpd.utoronto.ca/recordkeeping/; and
                  
                        2.    Documentation: Charting Medical Records eLearning Module,
                              CMPA -
                              http://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/websurvey/userprofile.html?profileType=ela&lang=en&elaRedirect=DocumentationCharting/documentation_charting-e.html
                  
                        3.    Documentation II: Principles of Medical Record Keeping
                              eLearning Module, CMPA -
                              http://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/websurvey/userprofile.html?profileType=ela&lang=en&elaRedirect=DocumentationPrinciples/documentation_principles-e.html
                  
                        4.    Effective Team Interactions, Saegis -
                              https://saegis.solutions/en/programs/details/01t41000003u3ouAAA
                  
                  (ii)  Review, provide a written summary of and discuss with my Clinical
                        Supervisor the following:
                  
                        1.    Medical Records -
                              www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Medical-Records
                  
                        2.    Test Results Management
                              www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Test-Results-Management
                  
                        3.    Confidentiality of Personal Health Information
                              www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Confidentiality-of-Personal-Health-Information
                              Other self-study
                  
                        4.    Steps to enhance practice efficiency: Part 1 -measuring
                              patient flow (OMA)
                              www.oma.org/wp-content/uploads/managingpatientworkflow_part1.pdf
                        5.    Steps to enhance practice efficiency: Part 2 - from challenge
                              to solution (OMA)
                              www.oma.org/wp-content/uploads/managingpatientworkflow_part2.pdf
                  
                        6.    Guide to enhancing referrals and consultations between
                              physicians (CFPC, Royal College)
                              www.cfpc.ca/uploadedFiles/Resources/Resource_Items/Health_Professionals/Guide%20to%20enhancing%20referrals%20and%20consultations%20between%20physicians.pdf
                  
                        7.    Review, written summary and discussion with the Clinical
                              Supervisor of the CPSO Practice Guide -
                              www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Practice-Guide
                  
                  (iii) individualized instruction in Professionalism satisfactory to the
                        College, with an instructor selected by the College; and
                  
                  (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical
                        Supervisor.
                  
            (b)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                  successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of
                  registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within
                  one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will
                  determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed
                  the Professional Education.

            (c)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake to complete the Professional Education by three
                  (3) months from the date I sign this Undertaking, or, if no satisfactory
                  program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity
                  thereafter.

            (d)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                  the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional
                  Education.

            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Michaud, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Michaud, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Michaud engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in her cardiology practice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Michaud will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for seven
                                    (7) months. 
                  
                                    Dr. Michaud will engage in professional education in
                                    recordkeeping, practice management, and
                                    professionalism.
                  
                                    Dr. Michaud's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College approximately six (6)
                                    months after the end of the period of Clinical
                                    Supervision.
                  
            (c)   I, Dr. Michaud, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until
                  the College determines its terms are satisfied.




            D.    CONSENT


            (16)  I, Dr. Michaud, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                        (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances
                              of my entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                        (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or
                              assessment of, my practice; and 
                  
                        (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance
                              with this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Michaud, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Michaud, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Josee Michaud to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 6, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Michaud engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her cardiology practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Michaud will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for seven (7) months.

Dr. Michaud will engage in professional education in recordkeeping, practice management, and professionalism.

Dr. Michaud’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately six (6) months after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 10, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)