skip to content

Michalik, Edward Jozef

CPSO#: 90412

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 05 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 May 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Edward Michalik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 May 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 May 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2015