skip to content

Michael, Kevin Anthony

CPSO#: 87082

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2400
Princess street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G4
Phone: 6135475450
Fax: 6135479177 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

PACE Cardiology
Suite 302
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Canada
Phone: 7057214422
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Michael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Michael ( CPSO# 87082 )

Business Address:
302 - 11 Lake Side Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 721-4422

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:10 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:08 Mar 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 26 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2017 Active
             Dr. Kevin Anthony Michael may practise medicine independently in cardiology.