skip to content

Mian, Najam Junaid

CPSO#: 95794

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1541 W Broadway
Unit 301
Vancouver BC  V6J 1W7
Phone: (604) 260-4481
Fax: (604) 325-8577

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Pain Medicine Effective:15 Jan 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAJAM JUNAID MIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016