skip to content

Mian, Ahmed Rafi

CPSO#: 90979

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-1111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ahmed Mian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mian ( CPSO# 90979 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital Church Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMED RAFI MIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011