skip to content

Mezon, Bernard Ronald James

CPSO#: 31248

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre, P O Box 5339, Station B, 339 Windermere Road, London, ON, N6A 5A5
Date Received: 18 Nov 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2017
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.