skip to content

Meulenkamp, Bradley George

CPSO#: 90742

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 18596
Fax: 613-761-4757 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bradley Meulenkamp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Meulenkamp ( CPSO# 90742 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Suite J 129
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRADLEY GEORGE MEULENKAMP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEULENKAMP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015