skip to content

Metrie, Mary Mamdouh Hanna

CPSO#: 98259

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
189 Hughson St S
Hamilton ON  L8N 2B6
Phone: 9055748630
Fax: 2897152544 Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: 189 Hughson St S Hamilton, ON L8N 2B6 Phone: 905-574-8630
Date Received: 09 Oct 2020


Address: Medical record requests should be directed to: 640 Concession St Hamilton ON L8V 1B5 Phone: 289 - 389-3686
Date Received: 21 Aug 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY MAMDOUH HANNA METRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. METRIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017