skip to content

Methot, Mireille

CPSO#: 99084

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014