skip to content

Methiwalla, Adnan

CPSO#: 97870

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 City Centre Drive, Suite 111
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Phone: 905-507-1111 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adnan Methiwalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Methiwalla ( CPSO# 97870 )

Business Address:
Suite 111
33 City Centre Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 2N5
Phone Number: (905) 507-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Aug 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADNAN METHIWALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. METHIWALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014