skip to content

Metcalfe, Brian John

CPSO#: 21783

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Jul 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre, 1 Hospital Drive, Peterborough, ON K9J 7C6
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:04 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016