skip to content

Mestre, Tiago Alexandre

CPSO#: 94208

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 2014
EXPIRY DATE
30 Apr 2024
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Lisboa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Neurology
Room 2196
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 18986 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tiago A. Mestre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mestre ( CPSO# 94208 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Neurology
Room 2174
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Portugal

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:01 Feb 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 14 Jul 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 25 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2021
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2024

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jan 2021 Active
 1. Dr. Tiago Alexandre Mestre may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Mestre holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Mestre no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Note: This certificate is issued on February 1, 2014, and expires on April 30, 2024. Upon renewal of Dr. Mestre's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.