skip to content

Meschino, Wendy Susan

CPSO#: 32065

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jun 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Meschino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: North York General Hospital 4001 Leslie St Toronto, ON M2K 1E1 OR Porcupine Health Unit 169 Pine St. S Timmins, ON P4N 8B7
Date Received: 21 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:12 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020