skip to content

Merskey, Harold

CPSO#: 29608

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 28 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Sep 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Oxford University, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Feb 2013

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 28, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Merskey has resigned from the College.