skip to content

Merritt, Thomas Rodman

CPSO#: 28544

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Apr 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:12 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2009