skip to content

Merritt, Richard Davidson

CPSO#: 23111

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard D. Merritt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking medical records of Dr. Merritt are to send a request to the office of Dr. Amber Sheikh (94301) at: Suite 305 4256 Portage Road Niagara Falls, ON L2E 6A4 Tel: (905) 358-6121
Date Received: 12 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Dec 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013