skip to content

Meret, Aleksander Jakob Madison

CPSO#: 95585

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
235 Danforth Avenue, #100
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 466-1311 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 540
790 Bay St
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 960-5883
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEKSANDER JAKOB MADISON MERET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015