skip to content

Merchant, Asad Ali

CPSO#: 92907

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of nephrology
University Of Toronto
8N819
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2G4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3047
Fax: (416) 340-4999 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASAD ALI MERCHANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCHANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2014