skip to content

Merali, Shamsh Yusuf

CPSO#: 27467

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 450
1100 Main St
Ignace ON  P0T 1T0
Phone: (807) 934-2251 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shamsh Merali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Merali ( CPSO# 27467 )

Business Address:
1100 Main Street
Box 450
Ignace ON  P0T 1T0

Medical Records Location

Address: For Oakville patients, requests should be forwarded to the same address that patients used to see Dr. Merali which is: Attention: Business Office Trafalgar Medical Clinic 1235 Trafalgar Road Oakville, ON L6H 3P1
Date Received: 22 Nov 2011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAMSH YUSUF MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1975