skip to content

Merali, Hasan Shamsh

CPSO#: 96678

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Div of Pediatric Emergency Medicine
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street West, HSC-2R104
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 570-8992 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Merali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Merali ( CPSO# 96678 )

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HASAN SHAMSH MERALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014