skip to content

Menzies, Fiona Virginia

CPSO#: 88829

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Care Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6770 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Fiona Menzies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Menzies ( CPSO# 88829 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FIONA VIRGINIA MENZIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENZIES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2013