skip to content

Menuck, Morton Norman

CPSO#: 24559

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Morton Menuck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2013