skip to content

Menon, Ranjith Krishna

CPSO#: 99195

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Medical Academy of Latvia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2013