skip to content

Mennie, Mary Kate Christina

CPSO#: 86352

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Paediatrics
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: 4165306294 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Flemingdon Health Centre
10 Gateway Blvd
Toronto ON  M3C3A1
Canada
Phone: 4164294991
Fax: 4164223573
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mennie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mennie ( CPSO# 86352 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care Centre
Department of Paediatrics
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6625

Business Address:
Flemingdon Health Centre
10 Gateway Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 429-4991

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY KATE CHRISTINA MENNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENNIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 16 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2011