Meneses Gartner, Myriam Andrea (CPSO#: 96201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 5922272
Fax: 9053369626
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington
Burlington ON  L7S1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Meneses Gartner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Meneses Gartner ( CPSO# 96201 )

Business Address:
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 592-2272


Corporation Name: Calvert Meneses Gartner Moghaddam-Abrishami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Meneses Gartner ( CPSO# 96201 )
Dr. L. Calvert ( CPSO# 71597 )
Dr. K. Moghaddam-Abrishami ( CPSO# 83521 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
4125 Upper Middle Road
Burlington ON  L7M 4X5

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 336-9630

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYRIAM ANDREA MENESES GARTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENESES GARTNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013