skip to content

Mendonca, Janet Ann

CPSO#: 85731

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Feb 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Goa Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30- 785 Westney Rd S
Ajax ON  L1S 7G1
Phone: (905) 239-5556
Fax: (905) 239-5757 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mendonca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mendonca ( CPSO# 85731 )

Business Address:
785 Westney Road South
Unit 30
Ajax ON  L1S 7G1
Phone Number: (905) 239-5556

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANET ANN MENDONCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDONCA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2009

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: January 6, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES
Janet Mendonca was charged with the following offences:

1. Two counts of obtaining payment for an insured service that she was not entitled to obtain, in 2015 and 2016, contrary to s. 43(1) of the Health Insurance Act.

2. Two counts of providing false information in an application made to OHIP or to the General Manager in respect of a claim for payment, in 2015 and 2016, contrary to s.43(3) of the Health Insurance Act.

Date of charges: October 22, 2020
Ontario Provincial Police