skip to content

Mendelson, Michael Maxwell

CPSO#: 91189

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hospital for Sick Children Department of Cardiology 555 University Avenue Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 04 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:19 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2015