Mendel, Arielle Edith (CPSO#: 100712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
60 Murray St
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIELLE EDITH MENDEL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MENDEL is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MENDEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MENDEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MENDEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MENDEL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MENDEL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2017 to 17 Dec 2017
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018