skip to content

Menard, Sonia

CPSO#: 91053

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Serbian

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P7P3
Phone: 9054727000 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 De Boers Dr
Toronto ON  M3J 0H1
Canada
Phone: 416-924-4646
Fax: 416-324-2556
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SONIA MENARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2013