skip to content

Menard, Matthew Robert Noel

CPSO#: 97127

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Non-Binary

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Haida Gwaii Hospital
2520 Harrison Avenue
Masset BC  V0T 1M0
Phone: (250) 626-4700

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW ROBERT NOEL MENARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 03 Jan 2012 to 15 Jan 2012
EL - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2012 to 27 Jan 2012
EL - Dermatology

Registration History