skip to content

Melicharkova, Andrea

CPSO#: 86617

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Spanish

Education:Universidad del Salvador, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4539
Fax: (705) 743-1449 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Melicharkova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA MELICHARKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELICHARKOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2011