skip to content

Melamed, Penina

CPSO#: 85808

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Black Creek Community Health Centre
2202 Jane St
Unit 5
Toronto ON  M3M 1A4
Phone: (416) 249-8000
Fax: (416) 249-4594 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PENINA MELAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELAMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2009