skip to content

Mekonnen Tizazu, Girma

CPSO#: 87632

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TAIBU COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTRE
27 Tapscott Road
Unit 1
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y7
Phone: 416 644 3539 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GIRMA MEKONNEN TIZAZU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEKONNEN TIZAZU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 04 Sep 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
CF - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2010