skip to content

Hwang, Mei Lump-Mee

CPSO#: 61395

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Jan 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education: University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 403
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 261-7223
Fax: (416) 261-6374 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Jan 2022

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Mei Lump-Mee Hwang’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Hwang engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, contravened terms, conditions and limitations on her certificate of registration, and failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to written inquiries from the College. The allegations relate to conduct including failing to respond to the College in a timely manner with respect to scheduling her attendance at a caution in person ordered by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee; failing to comply with or complete any of the components of an Undertaking to the College signed on January 7, 2022; failing to cooperate with the College’s investigation; and failing to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to written inquiries from the College.
 
It is further alleged that since approximately 2021, Dr. Hwang has engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct in the recordkeeping and administration of her practice in relation to Patient A, including failing to respond in a timely manner to requests for medical records and information made by, or in respect of, a patient, in failing to be on time and/or attend scheduled appointments, and in failing to cooperate with the College’s investigation. It is alleged that during the investigation into Patient A's complaint, Dr. Hwang failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to written inquiry/inquiries from the College.
 

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Merits; 2023-10-20

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 07 Jan 2022 Active
 As from January 7, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mei Lump-Mee Hwang in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hwang to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. MEI LUMP-MEE HWANG
("Dr. Hwang")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Hwang, certificate of registration number 61395, am a member of the College. 
 
(3)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-135546-T0Y0H1/Legacy File# 1104960 (the "Investigation") into a public complaint that raised concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine and my co-operation with the Investigation.

(4)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this Undertaking, the College will also deliver a caution in person. 

B.	UNDERTAKING

(5)	I, Dr. Hwang, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Hwang, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed Individualized Education Plan, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):
(i)	individualized instruction in professionalism satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College.

(ii)	Medical Record-Keeping Program, University of Toronto

(iii)	Review, reflection, written summary and discussion with ethics instructor of the following policies:        
    
1.	The College's Practice Guide: Medical Professionalism and College Policies;

2.	Medical Records Management, College Policy

3.	How to manage your medical records: Retention, access, security, storage, disposal and transfer, CMPA

(b)	I, Dr. Hwang, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Hwang, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(7)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Hwang, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Hwang, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(10)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(12)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(13)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(14)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into a public complaint about Dr. Hwang's family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Hwang will engage in professional education in professionalism and medical records management.

(c)	I, Dr. Hwang, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(15)	I, Dr. Hwang, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16)	I, Dr. Hwang, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. Hwang, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;  

(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 7, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hwang to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 7, 2022:

 

 

A College investigation was conducted into a public complaint about Dr. Hwang’s family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:



Dr. Hwang will engage in professional education in professionalism and medical records management.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: December 16, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
 
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 23, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)