skip to content

Mehta, Suryakant Dipchand

CPSO#: 28903

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Baroda University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Suryakant Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 815 College Street 1st Floor Toronto, ON M6G 1C9 4165331145
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Osama Shabash for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 05 Feb 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2016