skip to content

Mehta, Pran Nath

CPSO#: 23156

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili

Education:Gauhati University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pran Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 27 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 21 Oct 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017