skip to content

Mehta, Kevan Dilip

CPSO#: 96288

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Pediatric Respirology
Department of Pediatrics
3A- 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 73508
Fax: 905-524-5707 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 202
106 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9B 4E4
Canada
Phone: 416-742-0680
Fax: 416-742-0681
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dilip Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mehta ( CPSO# 33042 )
Dr. K. Mehta ( CPSO# 96288 )
Dr. S. Mehta ( CPSO# 106517)

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
4S-446 - 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6759


Corporation Name: Kevan Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mehta ( CPSO# 96288 )

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Suite 3A
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
106 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M9V 4E4
Phone Number: (416) 742-0681

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:09 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEVAN DILIP MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
CF - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016