skip to content

Mehta, Darshana Jayvardhan

CPSO#: 93182

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Saurashtra University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TOWNLINE MEDICAL CLINIC
940 Jamieson Parkway
Unit B4
Cambridge ON  N3C 4N6
Phone: 519-260-8100
Fax: 519-260-8200 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

940 JAMIESON PARKWAY
UNIT B4
Cambridge ON  N3C 4N6
Canada
Phone: 519-260-8100
Fax: 519-260-8200
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DARSHANA JAYVARDHAN MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Oct 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012