skip to content

Mehta, Chetan

CPSO#: 84605

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3rd Floor, Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St.
Toronto ON  M5V 2R4
Phone: (416) 323-7559 Ext. 6
Fax: (416)323-7739 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHETAN MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009