skip to content

Mehta, Adi Erach

CPSO#: 28037

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Sep 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1983
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Sep 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 1983