skip to content

Mehrmanesh, Zahra Flora

CPSO#: 25807

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Mar 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Flora Mehrmanesh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 111 St Regis Crescent South, North York, ON M3J 1Y6. (416) 398-0638
Date Received: 09 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:14 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016