skip to content

Mehrani, Mehvish

CPSO#: 98419

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prince Edward Medical
324 Prince Edward Dr. S. Unit 2
Toronto ON  M8Y 3Z5
Phone: (647) 345-3048
Fax: (647) 345-3058 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mehvish Mehrani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mehrani ( CPSO# 98419 )

Business Address:
324 Prince Edward Drive South
Unit 2
Toronto ON  M8Y 3Z5
Phone Number: (647) 345-3048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MEHVISH MEHRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHRANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014