skip to content

Mehdizadeh Hakak, Hamid

CPSO#: 92810

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Supervised Short Duration Practice as of 04 May 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2020